Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/18/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/18/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/22/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/24/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew