Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/30/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/11/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/11/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 09/11/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/18/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/25/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 09/30/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 09/30/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/20/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/03/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/08/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/08/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 01/08/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 01/08/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/08/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/03/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/03/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/25/2014