Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/16/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/16/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/16/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/16/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/17/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/18/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/18/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/18/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/18/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/19/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/19/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/23/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/23/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/24/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/24/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/24/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/24/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/24/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/24/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/24/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/24/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/26/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/26/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/26/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/26/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/26/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/26/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/26/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/26/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/30/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/30/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 08/01/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/25/2013