Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/16/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/26/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/26/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/10/2013