Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/22/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/01/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/01/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/05/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/12/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/12/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 02/13/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/21/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/10/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/25/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/13/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/25/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 08/01/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 08/02/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/09/2013