Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 06/28/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/11/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/24/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/24/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/31/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/31/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/31/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/01/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/01/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/01/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/01/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 10/16/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/30/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/19/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 11/19/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/13/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/29/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 02/05/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/27/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/10/2014