Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/28/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/17/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 08/01/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/01/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 08/02/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/09/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/09/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/19/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/19/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 10/04/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/11/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/28/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/28/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 10/30/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/14/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/14/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 11/18/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/04/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/09/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/11/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/19/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 01/03/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/10/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 02/04/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/05/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 02/05/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/14/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/11/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/11/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/24/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/24/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/27/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/27/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/27/2014