Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/08/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/11/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/16/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/17/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/18/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/18/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/25/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 08/01/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/09/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/19/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 09/26/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 10/28/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 10/29/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 01/09/2014