Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/22/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/04/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 02/04/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 02/04/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/04/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/04/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/04/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/05/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/05/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/08/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 02/08/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/13/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 02/13/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/13/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/26/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/28/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 02/28/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 03/07/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/07/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 03/07/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 03/07/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/14/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/19/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/19/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/21/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 05/20/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 05/20/2013