Refine your search

Date Major Actions
06/03/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-12.
06/03/2013 Signed by President.
05/28/2013 Presented to President.
05/22/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3789)
05/20/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 3 (Roll no. 161).(text: CR H2779)
05/20/2013 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-84.
01/15/2013 Introduced in House