Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/09/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/18/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/19/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/19/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/19/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/30/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/31/2013