Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 06/28/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/31/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/09/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 11/20/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 12/12/2013