Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/08/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 07/09/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/09/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/09/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/09/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/11/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/11/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/22/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/22/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/22/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/22/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/30/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/31/2013