Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/27/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 06/27/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/28/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/10/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/15/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 11/19/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/12/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/19/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/19/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 12/19/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/13/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/26/2014