Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/08/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/08/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/10/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/11/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 09/18/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/18/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/18/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/26/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/19/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/19/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 11/19/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/29/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/04/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/04/2014