Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/30/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/30/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/09/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/09/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/04/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/30/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/30/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/30/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/02/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/02/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 12/02/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/02/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/02/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 12/04/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 01/27/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/27/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/27/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/11/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/11/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 02/25/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/25/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 02/26/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/26/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/26/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 02/27/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/04/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/04/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/04/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/12/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 03/14/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/24/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/25/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/26/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/01/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/04/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/08/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/08/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/09/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/09/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/09/2014