Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 06/27/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/27/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/09/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/19/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/25/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/20/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/10/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 11/21/2013