Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/28/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/28/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/28/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/08/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/08/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/11/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 08/01/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/11/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/30/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/30/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 10/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/02/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/25/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/25/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/14/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/24/2014