Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 06/26/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/18/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/29/2014