Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 06/28/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/16/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/17/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/17/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/17/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/17/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/22/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/10/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/10/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/19/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/04/2014