Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 06/26/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 06/26/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/10/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/02/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 08/02/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/17/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 09/17/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/23/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/23/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/25/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/30/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/30/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/01/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/04/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/22/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/22/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/22/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/22/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/22/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/29/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/29/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/29/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/29/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/29/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/15/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/15/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/21/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/21/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 12/09/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/09/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/12/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/12/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/16/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/10/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/28/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/28/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/28/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/14/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/04/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/04/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/04/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/04/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/10/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/10/2014