Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/23/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/30/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/30/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/30/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/30/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 08/02/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 08/02/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/09/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 09/12/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/16/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 09/16/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 09/17/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/17/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/18/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/20/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 09/20/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/26/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/26/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/27/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/01/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/01/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/01/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/15/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/23/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/23/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/23/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/23/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 10/23/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/30/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 10/30/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/30/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 11/12/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 11/12/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/12/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/12/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 11/18/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 11/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/18/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/02/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/09/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/09/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/09/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 12/12/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/12/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/14/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 01/14/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/16/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/16/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/16/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 01/16/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/27/2014
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 02/06/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/26/2014