Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/27/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/27/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/17/2013