Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/23/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/18/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/27/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/30/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 10/08/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/04/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 03/04/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/04/2014