Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 01/14/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/14/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/17/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/10/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/02/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 09/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 10/09/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 10/16/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/25/2014