Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/15/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/25/2013