Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/25/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/20/2013