Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 06/20/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/25/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/05/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 02/05/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/05/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/05/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 02/06/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/10/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/10/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/25/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/26/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/04/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/04/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/04/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/04/2014