Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/20/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/20/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/26/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/26/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/27/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/08/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/17/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/07/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/13/2014