Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/25/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 06/26/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/26/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/15/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/24/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/30/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/06/2014