Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/25/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/15/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/15/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/16/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/18/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 07/18/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/18/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/18/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/22/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/22/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/22/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/23/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/23/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/23/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/24/2013