Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/01/2014