Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/25/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/26/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/23/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/23/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/17/2013