Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/19/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/26/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/27/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/08/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/02/2013