Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/26/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/08/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/02/2013