Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 06/17/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 06/17/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 06/17/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 06/17/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/17/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/18/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/18/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 06/18/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/26/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/19/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/24/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 08/01/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/11/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 09/30/2013