Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/17/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/19/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/11/2013