Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/14/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 06/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/18/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/18/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/18/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/20/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/20/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/28/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/08/2014