Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/17/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/17/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 06/17/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/17/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/20/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/20/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/20/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/20/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/25/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/25/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 06/25/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/25/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/27/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/27/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/22/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/22/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/22/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 07/22/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 09/11/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/11/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/17/2013