Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/13/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 06/13/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 01/21/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/27/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/04/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/06/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/03/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/04/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/08/2014