Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/26/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 01/29/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/29/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/10/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/10/2014