Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 06/12/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 06/12/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/13/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 06/13/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/14/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/14/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/14/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/18/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/20/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/25/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/25/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/28/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/16/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/23/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/25/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 08/01/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/09/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/09/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/16/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/19/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/23/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/25/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 09/25/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/27/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/08/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/10/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/23/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 10/28/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 11/14/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/18/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 12/09/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/03/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/05/2014
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/11/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/14/2014