Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/10/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 07/22/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 12/11/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew