Refine your search

Date Major Actions
12/26/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-70.
12/26/2013 Signed by President.
12/23/2013 Presented to President.
12/20/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9068)
12/11/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 0 (Roll no. 633).(text: CR H7639)
12/11/2013 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-287.
06/11/2013 Introduced in House