Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/18/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/26/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/26/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 08/01/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/13/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/12/2014