Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 06/11/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/11/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/13/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/20/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/20/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/08/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/08/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 09/17/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/17/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 10/23/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/15/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 12/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/10/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/10/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/11/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/04/2014