Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 06/10/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 06/10/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 06/10/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 06/10/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 06/10/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 06/11/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/13/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/13/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/18/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 07/08/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/09/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/18/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/22/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/22/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/22/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/23/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/23/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/25/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/06/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/11/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/20/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/08/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/08/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/11/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/11/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 10/16/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 10/16/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 10/16/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/16/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 10/16/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 10/23/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/19/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/05/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/09/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/15/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/16/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 01/31/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/26/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 02/26/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/09/2014