Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 06/06/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/20/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/17/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 08/01/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/11/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/11/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/11/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/26/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/26/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/23/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/30/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/30/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/19/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/19/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 01/27/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 03/13/2014