Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/11/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 06/13/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/11/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 08/01/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 10/28/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 10/28/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/28/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/26/2014