Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/11/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/12/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 06/13/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/13/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/13/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/14/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/17/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/18/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/19/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/20/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/08/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/08/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/17/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/24/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 07/26/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 09/19/2013